There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

TABS Act of 2016
Taking Account of Bureaucrats' Spending Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

TABS Act of 2015
Taking Account of Bureaucrats' Spending Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to bring the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection into the regular appropriations process, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/06/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-538.
03/19/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
05/06/2016Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/06/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-538.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
04/13/2016Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 20.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
04/13/2016Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
03/19/2015Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 03/19/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/24/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/24/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/21/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/01/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 05/20/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/20/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/01/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/10/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/02/2016
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/02/2016
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/02/2016
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 02/02/2016
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 02/02/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/02/2016
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/02/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 02/02/2016
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/02/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/02/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/02/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/02/2016
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 02/02/2016
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 02/02/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/04/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 02/04/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 02/04/2016
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/04/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/04/2016
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/04/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/04/2016
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 02/04/2016
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/04/2016
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/04/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/04/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/04/2016
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 02/04/2016
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/09/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/09/2016
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/12/2016
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/12/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 03/02/2016
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 04/12/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/14/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/14/2016
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/14/2016
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/26/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/19/2015 Referred to
04/13/2016 Markup by
05/06/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-538

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1486. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (05/06/2016)

Taking Account of Bureaucrats' Spending Act of 2016 or the TABS Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to eliminate provisions that fund the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) using transfers from the earnings of the Federal Reserve System. The transfers under current law permit the CFPB to be funded outside of the annual appropriations process, and this bill brings the CFPB into the regular process.