There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Corolla Wild Horses Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Corolla Wild Horses Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to enter into an agreement to provide for management of the free-roaming wild horses in and around the Currituck National Wildlife Refuge.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/20/2015Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-84.
01/06/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
04/20/2015Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 62.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/20/2015Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-84.
03/25/2015Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
03/25/2015Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/25/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/24/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/02/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/06/2015Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/06/2015 Referred to
03/25/2015 Markup by
04/20/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-84
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/02/2015 Referred to
03/25/2015 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.152. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (04/20/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Corolla Wild Horses Protection Act

Directs the Department of the Interior to enter into an agreement with the Corolla Wild Horse Fund, Currituck County, North Carolina, and the state of North Carolina to provide for the management of free-roaming wild horses in and around the Currituck National Wildlife Refuge.

Requires that such agreement: (1) allow a herd of between 110 and 130 free-roaming wild horses in and around the Refuge; (2) provide for cost-effective management of such horses while ensuring that natural resources within the Refuge are not adversely impacted; (3) provide for the introduction of a small number of free-roaming wild horses from the herd at Cape Lookout National Seashore as is necessary to maintain the genetic viability of the herd in and around the Refuge; and (4) require such Fund to pay the costs of inspecting the health of the horses, maintaining records, coordinating the removal and placement of such horses, and administering a viable population control plan for the horses.

Prohibits the removal of any horse from the Seashore for introduction at the Refuge except with the approval of the Foundation for Shackleford Horses Inc. and consistent with the memorandum of understanding between the National Park Service and the Foundation and the management plan for the Shackleford Banks Horse Herd.

Declares that nothing in this Act shall be construed as creating liability of the United States for any damages caused by the free-roaming wild horses to any person or property located inside or outside the boundaries of the Refuge.