There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Land Management Workforce Flexibility Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Land Management Workforce Flexibility Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Land Management Workforce Flexibility Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Land Management Workforce Flexibility Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Land Management Workforce Flexibility Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Land Management Workforce Flexibility Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to provide a pathway for temporary seasonal employees in Federal land management agencies to compete for vacant permanent positions under internal merit promotion procedures, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
08/28/2015By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2015. Report No. 114-123.
08/07/2015Became Public Law No: 114-47. (TXT | PDF)
08/07/2015Signed by President.
08/06/2015Presented to President.
08/05/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6425)
08/04/2015Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
07/07/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4782)
06/25/2015Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-182.
03/23/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
08/28/2015SenateBy Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2015. Report No. 114-123.
08/07/2015Became Public Law No: 114-47. (TXT | PDF)
08/07/2015Signed by President.
08/06/2015HousePresented to President.
08/06/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/05/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6425)
08/04/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 192.
08/04/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
07/29/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
07/08/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/07/2015-2:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/07/2015-2:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4782)
07/07/2015-2:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1531.
07/07/2015-2:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4782-4783)
07/07/2015-2:36pmHouseMr. Carter (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/25/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 134.
06/25/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-182.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/25/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/25/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/23/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
03/23/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform03/23/2015 Referred to
03/25/2015 Markup by
06/25/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-182
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/08/2015 Referred to
07/29/2015 Markup by
08/04/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-123

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for H.R.1531. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-47 (08/07/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Land Management Workforce Flexibility Act

(Sec. 2) Makes an employee of specified land management agencies in the Department of the Interior serving under a time-limited, including a temporary, appointment in the competitive service eligible to compete for a permanent appointment in any land management agency or any other agency if: (1) the original appointment was competitive, (2) the employee has served under one or more time-limited appointments totaling more than 24 months without a break of two or more years, and (3) the employee's performance has been at an acceptable level.

Requires the Office of Personnel Management or other examining agency, in determining the eligibility of a time-limited employee to be examined for or appointed in the competitive service, to waive requirements as to age, unless the requirement is essential to the performance of the duties of the position.

Provides that an individual appointed under the provisions of this Act becomes a career-conditional employee and acquires competitive status upon appointment.

Deems a former employee of a land management agency who served under a time-limited appointment and who otherwise meets applicable requirements to be a time-limited employee for purposes of this Act if: (1) such employee applies for a position covered by this Act within two years after the most recent date of separation, and (2) such employee's most recent separation was for reasons other than misconduct or performance.