There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Elkhorn Ranch and White River National Forest Conveyance Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

Elkhorn Ranch and White River National Forest Conveyance Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Elkhorn Ranch and White River National Forest Conveyance Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Elkhorn Ranch and White River National Forest Conveyance Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a land conveyance involving the Elkhorn Ranch and the White River National Forest in the State of Colorado, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
12/16/2015Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-195.
09/16/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5997-5998)
09/09/2015Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-257.
03/23/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/16/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 340.
12/16/2015SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-195.
11/19/2015SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/08/2015SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-490.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining
09/17/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/16/2015-4:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/16/2015-3:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5997-5998)
09/16/2015-3:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1554.
09/16/2015-3:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5997-5998)
09/16/2015-3:54pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/09/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
09/09/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-257.
07/09/2015HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
07/09/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/09/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/08/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/16/2015HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
04/08/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/23/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/23/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/23/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/23/2015 Referred to
07/09/2015 Markup by
09/09/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-257
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands04/08/2015 Referred to
06/16/2015 Hearings by
07/09/2015 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/17/2015 Referred to
11/19/2015 Markup by
12/16/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-195
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining10/08/2015 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1554. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (12/16/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Elkhorn Ranch and White River National Forest Conveyance Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill requires all interest of the United States in 148 acres of identified land shall be conveyed by patent to the Gordman-Leverich Partnership (GLP), a Colorado Limited Liability Partnership.

The conveyance: (1) is subject to the valid existing rights of the lessee of federal oil and gas lease COC-75070 and any other valid existing rights, and (2) shall reserve to the United States the right to collect rent and royalty payments on such lease for its duration.

The conveyance does not modify the exterior boundary of the White River National Forest in Colorado nor the boundaries of Sections 18 and 19 of a certain Township in Colorado, as such boundaries are in effect on the date of enactment of this Act.

The conveyance shall: (1) be completed by no later than 180 days of enactment of this Act; and (2) be without consideration, except that all costs incurred by the Department of the Interior relating to any survey, platting, legal description, or other activities carried out to prepare and issue the patent shall be paid by GLP to Interior prior to the conveyance of such land.