There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Contracting and Tax Accountability Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

Contracting and Tax Accountability Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Contracting and Tax Accountability Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the awarding of a contract or grant in excess of the simplified acquisition threshold unless the prospective contractor or grantee certifies in writing to the agency awarding the contract or grant that the contractor or grantee has no seriously delinquent tax debts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/15/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 156).(text: CR H2241-2242)
04/14/2015Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-72.
03/24/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
04/16/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
04/15/2015-5:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/15/2015-5:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 156). (text: CR H2241-2242)
04/15/2015-5:11pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2251-2252)
04/15/2015-3:26pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/15/2015-3:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1562.
04/15/2015-3:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2241-2243)
04/15/2015-3:14pmHouseMr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/14/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 52.
04/14/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-72.
03/25/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/25/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/24/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
03/24/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/24/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/14/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform03/24/2015 Referred to
03/25/2015 Markup by
04/14/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-72
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs04/16/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1562.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1562. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (04/15/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Contracting and Tax Accountability Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Declares it the policy of the U.S. government that no government contracts or grants should be awarded to individuals or companies with seriously delinquent federal tax debts.

(Sec. 3) Requires the head of any executive agency that issues an invitation for bids or a request for proposals for a contract, or that offers a grant, in an amount greater than the simplified acquisition threshold, to require each person submitting a bid or proposal or grant application to: (1) certify that such person does not have a seriously delinquent tax debt, and (2) authorize the Department of the Treasury to disclose information limited to describing whether such person has a seriously delinquent tax debt. Subjects a person who has a seriously delinquent tax debt to a negative responsibility or high risk determination when applying for a federal contract or grant, or to suspension or debarment from the federal procurement process. Authorizes an agency head to waive a suspension or debarment proceeding for a person with a seriously delinquent tax debt upon a written finding of urgent and compelling circumstances significantly affecting the interests of the United States.

(Sec. 5) Defines "seriously delinquent tax debt" as a federal tax liability that has been assessed by the Internal Revenue Service and is collectible by levy or a court proceeding, except a tax debt: (1) that is being paid in a timely manner under an approved installment agreement or an offer-in-compromise, (2) for which a collection due process hearing has been requested or is pending; (3) for which a continuous levy has been issued or agreed to by an applicant for employment, or (4) with respect to which such a levy is released because it has been determined to be an economic hardship to the taxpayer.

(Sec. 6) Makes this Act applicable to contracts and grants awarded on or after 270 days after the enactment date of this Act.