There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Religious Minorities Persecuted by ISIS Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish processes for certain aliens located in Iraq and certain other countries who are or were nationals or residents of Iraq or Syria who have been persecuted or have a credible fear of being persecuted by the group commonly known as the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant, or by a similar group, to apply and interview for admission to the United States as refugees, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/24/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
04/21/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/24/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 03/24/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/24/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 03/24/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/15/2015
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 04/15/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/16/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/22/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/22/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/22/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/05/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 05/05/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/05/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/05/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/05/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/05/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/05/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/05/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/13/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 05/13/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/20/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/10/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/10/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/10/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/10/2015
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/10/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/10/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/08/2015
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/08/2015
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 09/24/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/24/2015
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 09/24/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/24/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/20/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/20/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/20/2015
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/26/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/26/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/04/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/05/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/09/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/24/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security04/21/2015 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs03/24/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1568.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1568. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/24/2015)

Protecting Religious Minorities Persecuted by ISIS Act of 2015

This bill directs the Secretary of State to establish or use existing refugee processing mechanisms in Iraq and in other countries through which aliens from Iraq or Syria who have been persecuted, or have a credible fear of being persecuted, by the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant (ISIS/ISIL), or a similar group, based on gender or religious or ethnic membership may apply directly to the United States Refugee Admissions Program for priority 2 refugee admission to the United States.

The processing mechanisms shall ensure that background and security checks are conducted, including the use of biographic and biometric data.

The Secretary of State shall: (1) report to Congress a plan to expedite the processing of refugee admissions applications for such aliens, and (2) implement the plan within 180 days of enactment of this Act.

It is U.S. policy that when conflict arises the United States should:

  • undertake efforts with the international community to protect local populations and enable them to remain safely in their home countries or in neighboring host countries until they can be safely repatriated; and
  • facilitate third country resettlement if necessary, including U.S. resettlement when such refugees are of special humanitarian concern to the United States.