There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS FOIA Efficiency Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

DHS FOIA Efficiency Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

DHS FOIA Efficiency Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Chief FOIA Officer of the Department of Homeland Security to make certain improvements in the implementation of section 552 of title 5, United States Code (commonly known as the Freedom of Information Act), and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/25/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 387).(text: CR 6/23/2015 H4570-4571)
06/11/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-148.
03/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
07/07/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
06/25/2015-10:58amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/25/2015-10:58amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 387). (text: CR 6/23/2015 H4570-4571)
06/25/2015-10:51amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4665-4666)
06/23/2015-4:48pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/23/2015-4:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1615.
06/23/2015-4:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4570-4572)
06/23/2015-4:41pmHouseMr. Carter (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/11/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 106.
06/11/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-148.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/13/2015HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency
05/13/2015HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency
04/07/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/25/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/25/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/25/2015 Referred to
05/20/2015 Markup by
06/11/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-148
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency04/07/2015 Referred to
05/13/2015 Markup by
05/13/2015 Reported by
Senate Judiciary07/07/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1615.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1615. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/25/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House of Representatives on June 11, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

DHS FOIA Efficiency Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Directs the Chief FOIA Officer of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS):

  • within 90 days after enactment of this Act, to issue an updated regulation implementing the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) and to identify the total annual implementation costs;
  • to develop guidance on reporting standards related to costs of processing FOIA requests;
  • within 120 days after enactment of this Act, to identify unnecessary and duplicative actions taken by DHS in processing such requests;
  • to eliminate such actions within 12 months after identifying them; and
  • within 90 days after enactment of this Act, to develop a plan to automate the processing of requests and to issue guidance to the relevant DHS components regarding the goal of reducing the backlog in processing requests by 50% between FY2015 and FY2018.

Requires the regulation implementing FOIA to include: (1) public guidance on procedures to be followed when making requests for DHS rules, opinions, orders, records, or proceedings; (2) updated guidance to the DHS components for processing such requests, which may include information on automated processing; and (3) detailed information on fees and costs associated with, and on the appeals process for, requests.

Directs the Chief FOIA Officer to include: (1) in each semiannual privacy report submitted under the Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004, the total costs to DHS of meeting FOIA requirements and assessments of progress made toward meeting backlog goals, of whether DHS has adequate staffing and other resources to address such goals, and of progress made toward automating the processing of requests; and (2) in the second semiannual privacy report for FY2016, a description of any cost savings identified from, and the plan developed for, automating the processing of requests.

(Sec. 3) Directs the Chief FOIA Officer to provide such plan, upon completion, to DHS components and seek written feedback regarding the extent to which each component will adopt the plan, the associated costs, and the projected time lines.