There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

DHS IT Duplication Reduction Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS IT Duplication Reduction Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

DHS IT Duplication Reduction Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

DHS IT Duplication Reduction Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

DHS IT Duplication Reduction Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reduce duplication of information technology at the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
08/06/2015Became Public Law No: 114-43. (TXT | PDF)
08/06/2015Signed by President.
07/27/2015Presented to President.
07/23/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/23/2015Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5558-5559)
06/23/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4572)
06/17/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-162.
03/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
08/06/2015Became Public Law No: 114-43. (TXT | PDF)
08/06/2015Signed by President.
07/27/2015HousePresented to President.
07/24/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/23/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/23/2015SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5558-5559)
06/24/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/23/2015-4:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/23/2015-4:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4572)
06/23/2015-4:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1626.
06/23/2015-4:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4572)
06/23/2015-4:48pmHouseMr. Hurd (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/17/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 118.
06/17/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-162.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/13/2015HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency
05/13/2015HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency
04/07/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/25/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/25/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/25/2015 Referred to
05/20/2015 Markup by
06/17/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-162
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency04/07/2015 Referred to
05/13/2015 Markup by
05/13/2015 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/24/2015 Referred to
07/23/2015 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1626. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-43 (08/06/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 17, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

DHS IT Duplication Reduction Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Directs the Chief Information Officer of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to report on:

  • the number of information technology systems at DHS;
  • the number of such systems exhibiting duplication or fragmentation (i.e., where there are two or more systems or programs that deliver similar functionality to similar user populations);
  • a strategy for reducing such duplicative systems, including an assessment of potential cost savings; and
  • a methodology for determining which system should be eliminated when there is duplication or fragmentation.