There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS Paid Administrative Leave Accountability Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

DHS Paid Administrative Leave Accountability Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

DHS Paid Administrative Leave Accountability Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for certain improvements relating to the tracking and reporting of employees of the Department of Homeland Security placed on administrative leave, or any other type of paid non-duty status without charge to leave, for personnel matters, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/23/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4566-4567)
06/17/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-163.
03/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/24/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/23/2015-4:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/23/2015-4:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4566-4567)
06/23/2015-4:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1633.
06/23/2015-4:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4566-4569)
06/23/2015-4:22pmHouseMr. Loudermilk moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/17/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 119.
06/17/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-163.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/13/2015HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency
05/13/2015HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency
04/07/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/25/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/25/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/25/2015 Referred to
05/20/2015 Markup by
06/17/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-163
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency04/07/2015 Referred to
05/13/2015 Markup by
05/13/2015 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/24/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1633.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1633. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/23/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 17, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

DHS Paid Administrative Leave Accountability Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the head of each component of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), on a quarterly basis, to submit to the Chief Human Capital Officer of DHS (the Chief): (1) the number of employees who had been on administrative leave, or any other type of paid non-duty status without charge to leave, for personnel matters for six consecutive months or longer; (2) the total cost to the component associated with such leave and paid non-duty status for the quarter; and (3) the average duration that employees are placed on administrative leave, or any other type of paid non-duty status without charge to leave, for personnel matters for a period of six consecutive months or longer.

Requires the Chief to: (1) maintain records of the number of such employees and the associated costs; and (2) determine appropriate actions to be taken by DHS to resolve any personnel matter objectively, appropriately, and expeditiously or to reduce the use of such leave and paid non-duty status in addressing any personnel matter.

Encourages DHS to leverage systems and operations in use on the date of this Act's enactment to implement this Act's requirements.

(Sec. 3) Directs the Chief to develop and implement a department-wide policy in accordance with existing federal guidance specifically related to the use of such leave or paid non-duty status for personnel matters.

Requires such policy to: (1) include the responsibilities of the DHS components for reporting information relating to such administrative leave and such paid non-duty status to the Chief, and (2) provide guidance on expediting the resolution of a personnel matter for which an employee has been on administrative leave or any other type of paid non-duty status without charge to leave for a period of six consecutive months or longer in an objective and appropriate manner.

(Sec. 4) Directs the Chief to submit a report after each calendar quarter of 2016-2018 on the number of DHS employees on such leave or paid non-duty status for personnel matters for six consecutive months or longer.

Requires each such report to include: (1) the costs to DHS associated with the placement of such employees on administrative leave or such paid non-duty status (including salary and benefits) for the period covered by the report; and (2) a description of any actions taken by DHS to resolve any personnel matter for which an employee has been placed on administrative leave or paid non-duty status without charge to leave.