There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Border Security Technology Accountability Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Border Security Technology Accountability Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To strengthen accountability for deployment of border security technology at the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/27/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5494)
07/27/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-226.
03/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/28/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/27/2015-4:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/27/2015-4:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5494)
07/27/2015-4:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1634.
07/27/2015-4:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5494-5495)
07/27/2015-4:11pmHouseMs. McSally moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/27/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 171.
07/27/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-226.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/25/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/25/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
04/07/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/25/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/25/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/25/2015 Referred to
06/25/2015 Markup by
07/27/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-226
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security04/07/2015 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/28/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1634. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/27/2015)

Border Security Technology Accountability Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) ensure that each border security technology acquisition program that is determined to be a major acquisition program has an acquisition program baseline approved by the relevant acquisition decision authority; (2) document that each such program is meeting the cost, schedule, and performance thresholds specified in such baseline in compliance with relevant departmental acquisition policies and the Federal Acquisition Regulation; and (3) have a plan for each such program to meet program implementation objectives by managing contractor performance.

Directs: (1) the Under Secretary for Management and the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection to ensure that border security technology acquisition program managers adhere to relevant internal control standards identified by the Comptroller General, and (2) the Commissioner to provide information to assist the Under Secretary in monitoring proper program management of such acquisition programs.

Requires the Under Secretary for Management, in coordination with the Under Secretary for Science and Technology and the Commissioner, to submit a plan for testing and evaluation, as well as the use of independent verification and validation resources, for border security technology so that new border security technologies are evaluated through a series of assessments, processes, and audits to ensure compliance with relevant departmental acquisition policies and the Federal Acquisition Regulation, as well as the effectiveness of taxpayer dollars.

Defines "major acquisition program" to mean a DHS acquisition program that is estimated by DHS to require an eventual total expenditure of at least $300 million over its life cycle cost.