There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Federally Funded Research and Development Sunshine Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

Federally Funded Research and Development Sunshine Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Federally Funded Research and Development Sunshine Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require annual reports on the activities and accomplishments of federally funded research and development centers within the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/23/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4573)
06/11/2015Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-149.
03/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
06/24/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/23/2015-5:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/23/2015-5:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4573)
06/23/2015-4:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1637.
06/23/2015-4:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4572-4574)
06/23/2015-4:55pmHouseMr. Ratcliffe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/11/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 107.
06/11/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-149.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseSubcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
04/07/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
04/07/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/25/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/25/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/25/2015 Referred to
05/20/2015 Markup by
06/11/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-149
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies04/07/2015 Referred to
05/20/2015 Discharged from
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency04/07/2015 Referred to
05/20/2015 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/24/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1637.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1637. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/23/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Federally Funded Research and Development Sunshine Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to annually submit to the Committee on Homeland Security, the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and the Committee on Appropriations of the House of Representatives and the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs, the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, and the Committee on Appropriations of the Senate a list of ongoing and completed projects that federally funded research and development centers within DHS have been tasked to complete.

Prohibits additional funds from being authorized to be appropriated to carry out this Act.