There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Homeland Security Headquarters Consolidation Accountability Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

Department of Homeland Security Headquarters Consolidation Accountability Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Homeland Security Headquarters Consolidation Accountability Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to submit to Congress a report on the Department of Homeland Security headquarters consolidation project in the National Capital Region, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/23/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4564-4565)
06/17/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-166.
03/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/24/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/23/2015-4:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/23/2015-4:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4564-4565)
06/23/2015-4:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1640.
06/23/2015-4:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4564-4566)
06/23/2015-4:13pmHouseMr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/17/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
06/17/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-166.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/20/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/13/2015HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency
05/13/2015HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency
04/07/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/25/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/25/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/25/2015 Referred to
05/20/2015 Markup by
06/17/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-166
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency04/07/2015 Referred to
05/13/2015 Markup by
05/13/2015 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/24/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1640. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/23/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 17, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Department of Homeland Security Headquarters Consolidation Accountability Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), in coordination with the General Services Administration (GSA), to submit a report on the DHS headquarters consolidation project within the National Capital Region, including:

  • a proposed occupancy plan that includes specific information about which DHS-wide operations, component operations, and support offices will be located at the site, the aggregate number of full time equivalent employees projected to occupy the site, and schedule estimates for migrating operations to the site;
  • a comprehensive assessment of the real property needed by DHS in the Region to carry out its mission to secure the homeland and defend against terrorism;
  • an analysis of the difference between the current and needed capital assets and facilities of DHS;
  • a current plan for construction of the headquarters consolidation at the St. Elizabeth's campus that includes the estimated costs and schedule for the current plan and any estimated costs savings associated with reducing the scope of the project and increasing the use of existing capacity developed under the project;
  • a current plan for the leased portfolio of DHS in the Region that includes the total rentable square feet, number of personnel, and proposed utilization rates, the replacement and consolidation plan, including an end-state vision that identifies which DHS-wide operations, component operations, and support offices do not migrate to the St. Elizabeths campus and continue to operate at a property in the leased portfolio, the number of full time equivalent employees who are expected to operate at each property, component, or office, and timing and anticipated leased terms for leased space, and the costs and benefits of leasing and construction alternatives; and
  • a detailed list of alternatives considered by DHS during the plan's development, including their costs and benefits.

Directs DHS, in coordination with GSA, to complete the update of the cost and schedule estimates for the portions of the project that are not yet complete based on the information contained in the report. Directs the Comptroller General to review the update, evaluate the quality and reliability of such estimates, and report on the results.