There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the direct provision of defense articles, defense services, and related training to the Kurdistan Regional Government, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/26/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
12/09/2015Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
12/09/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/26/2015Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/26/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 03/26/2015
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/13/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/13/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/13/2015
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/13/2015
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/13/2015
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/14/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/14/2015
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/21/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/23/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/23/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 04/28/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/12/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 05/15/2015
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 06/02/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/24/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 06/24/2015
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 12/09/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 12/10/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/26/2015 Referred to
12/09/2015 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1654.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1654. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/26/2015)

Expresses the sense of Congress that:

  • defeating the Islamic State in Iraq and the Levant (ISIL) is critical to maintaining a unified Iraq in which all faiths and ethnicities are afforded equal protection and full integration into the government and society;
  • the people of Kurdistan face a deadly threat from ISIL which the Iraqi Security Forces, of which the Peshmerga are a component, are currently unable to match in armaments;
  • any outstanding issues between the government of Iraq and the Kurdistan Regional Government (KRG) should be resolved expeditiously to allow for a resumption of normal relations; and
  • ISIL's continued growth presents an imminent threat to Iraqi Kurdistan, the rest of Iraq and the Middle East, and international security.

Authorizes the President to: (1) provide defense articles, defense services, and related training directly to the KRG to support international coalition efforts against ISIL or any successor group; and (2) issue licenses authorizing U.S. exporters to export defense articles, defense services, and related training directly to the KRG.

Prohibits the provision of any defense article, service, or related training to the KRG under this Act unless the KRG agrees that it will not:

  • provide any such defense article, service, or training to anyone who is not a KRG officer, employee, or agent; or
  • use or permit the use of any such defense article, service, or training for purposes other than those for which it was provided, unless the President's consent has been obtained.