There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Secret Service Improvements Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Secret Service Improvements Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Secret Service Improvements Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for additional resources for the Secret Service, and to improve protections for restricted areas.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
07/13/2016Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-302.
07/27/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 365 - 16 (Roll no. 468).(text: CR H5491-5492)
07/27/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-231.
03/26/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
07/13/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 560.
07/13/2016SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-302.
02/10/2016SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/28/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/27/2015-7:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 365 - 16 (Roll no. 468). (text: CR H5491-5492)
07/27/2015-7:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/27/2015-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5511-5512)
07/27/2015-4:10pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/27/2015-3:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1656.
07/27/2015-3:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5491-5494)
07/27/2015-3:55pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/27/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 174.
07/27/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-231.
07/15/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/15/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/14/2015HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged.
04/29/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/26/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/26/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/26/2015 Referred to
07/15/2015 Markup by
07/27/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-231
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations04/29/2015 Referred to
07/14/2015 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/28/2015 Referred to
02/10/2016 Markup by
07/13/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-302

No related bill information was received for H.R.1656.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1656. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/13/2016)

Secret Service Improvements Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the federal criminal code to prohibit knowingly causing an autonomous or remotely operated vehicle or dangerous weapon to enter any restricted building or grounds so that it impedes or disrupts the orderly conduct of government business or official functions.

The punishment for such offense is a fine, imprisonment for not more than 10 years, or both, if during and in relation to the offense a deadly or dangerous weapon or firearm enters the restricted building or grounds.

The term "restricted buildings or grounds" is revised to include: (1) any restricted area of a building or grounds that the President or other person protected by the Secret Service has designated as a non-governmental property in accordance with the Presidential Protection Assistance Act of 1976, and (2) the airspace above any such restricted area.

(Sec. 3) The bill applies provisions prohibiting threats against former Presidents and others to threats against former Vice Presidents, their spouses, and their minor children.

(Sec. 4) The Secret Service shall increase the annual number of training hours for Secret Service officers and agents. The increased training must include the recommendations for training described in the United States Secret Service Protective Mission Panel Report, released on December 15, 2014.

(Sec. 5) The Secret Service is authorized to: (1) construct facilities at the Rowley Training Center necessary to improve the training of officers of the U.S. Secret Service Uniformed Division and agents of the Secret Service, and (2) hire the number of officers for the Uniformed Division and agents for the Presidential Protective Detail necessary to satisfy the staffing recommendations made by such report.

(Sec. 7) The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall devise and adopt improved procedures for identifying, evaluating, and addressing vulnerabilities in the security of the White House and threats to persons protected by the Secret Service, including threats posed by unmanned aerial systems or explosive devices.

(Sec. 8) The Secret Service shall devise and adopt improved procedures for: (1) evaluating ways in which technology may be used to improve the security of the White House and the response to threats to persons protected by the Secret Service, and (2) retaining evidence pertaining to such ways for an appropriate period.

(Sec. 9) The Secret Service: (1) shall evaluate the practicability of equipping agents and officers with additional non-lethal weapons, and (2) may evaluate the practicability of equipping agents and officers with weapons beyond those currently provided.

(Sec. 10) Provisions of the Presidential Protection Assistance Act of 1976 requiring specified congressional committee approval of expenditures above a specified amount by the Secret Service for securing any non-governmental property in addition to the one non-governmental property designated by each protectee are replaced with provisions requiring specified congressional committee notification of any such expenditures.

(Sec. 11) The bill requires the establishment of an Ethics Program Office in the Office of the Chief Counsel of the Secret Service to ensure compliance with the Ethics in Government Act of 1978.

(Sec. 12) The Government Accountability Office shall report to Congress with a review of this bill's implementation and an evaluation of the Secret Service's progress in implementing recommendations outlined in the panel report.