Committees: H.R.1656 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/26/2015 Referred to
07/15/2015 Markup by
07/27/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-231
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations04/29/2015 Referred to
07/14/2015 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/28/2015 Referred to
02/10/2016 Markup by
07/13/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-302