There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National POW/MIA Remembrance Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

National POW/MIA Remembrance Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

National POW/MIA Remembrance Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National POW/MIA Remembrance Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Architect of the Capitol to place in the United States Capitol a chair honoring American Prisoners of War/Missing in Action.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-147. (TXT | PDF)
04/29/2016Signed by President.
04/19/2016Presented to President.
04/14/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2106)
03/21/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1469-1470)
02/01/2016Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 114-410.
03/26/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
04/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-147. (TXT | PDF)
04/29/2016Signed by President.
04/19/2016HousePresented to President.
04/15/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/14/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2106)
04/04/2016SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
03/21/2016-4:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/21/2016-4:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1469-1470)
03/21/2016-4:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1670.
03/21/2016-4:02pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1469-1472)
03/21/2016-4:01pmHouseMrs. Miller (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/01/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 313.
02/01/2016HouseReported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 114-410.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
12/02/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
12/02/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
03/26/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
03/26/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 03/26/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/26/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/22/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/01/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/04/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/11/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 07/10/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 07/23/2015
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/29/2015
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 08/04/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 08/04/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/16/2015
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/16/2015
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/25/2015
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 09/25/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/20/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/20/2015
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/17/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 11/17/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 11/17/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/17/2015
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 11/17/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/17/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 11/17/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/17/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/30/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/30/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 12/03/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration03/26/2015 Referred to
12/02/2015 Markup by
02/01/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-410

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1670. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-147 (04/29/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

National POW/MIA Remembrance Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Architect of the Capitol (AOC) to: (1) enter into an agreement to obtain a chair featuring the logo of the National League of POW/MIA Families, and (2) place it in the U.S. Capitol in a suitable permanent location within two years after enactment of this Act.

(Sec. 4) The AOC may: (1) enter into an agreement with any tax-exempt, charitable organization to solicit private donations to carry out this Act; and (2) accept resulting donations of funds, property, and services.

All costs incurred in carrying out this Act's purposes shall be paid for with private donations received from such organizations.