There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Government Neutrality in Contracting Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Government Neutrality in Contracting Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To preserve open competition and Federal Government neutrality towards the labor relations of Federal Government contractors on Federal and federally funded construction projects.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/23/2016Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-471.
03/26/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/23/2016Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 357.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/23/2016Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-471.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
01/12/2016Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
01/12/2016Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/26/2015Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 04/13/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/13/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 04/13/2015
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/16/2015
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 04/16/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/16/2015
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 04/16/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/22/2015
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 04/22/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/13/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/13/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 05/13/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/13/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 05/19/2015
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/19/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 06/03/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/03/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/09/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/09/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/09/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/10/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/23/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/25/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/25/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 06/25/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/25/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/07/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/07/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/08/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/09/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/14/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/16/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/21/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/28/2015
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 09/09/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/11/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/11/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/11/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/16/2015
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/17/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 09/17/2015
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 09/29/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/29/2015
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/29/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/29/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/29/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/29/2015
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/29/2015
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/30/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/30/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/30/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/30/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 09/30/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/30/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/30/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/01/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/07/2015
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 10/07/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 10/08/2015
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/20/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/20/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 10/20/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 10/26/2015
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/27/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 11/02/2015
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/03/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/03/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/03/2015
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 11/03/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/18/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 12/01/2015
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/01/2015
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/02/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/02/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/03/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/07/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/07/2015
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 12/10/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/10/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 12/10/2015
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 12/16/2015
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 12/16/2015
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/16/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 01/05/2016
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/08/2016
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/12/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 01/12/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 02/04/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/11/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/11/2016
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/15/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform03/26/2015 Referred to
01/12/2016 Markup by
03/23/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-471

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1671. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (03/23/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Government Neutrality in Contracting Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the head of any federal agency that awards or obligates funds for any construction contract, or that awards grants, provides financial assistance, or enters into cooperative agreements for construction projects, to ensure that bid specifications, project agreements, or other controlling documents do not: (1) require or prohibit a bidder, offeror, contractor, or subcontractor from entering into, or adhering to, agreements with a labor organization, with respect to that construction project or another related construction project; or (2) otherwise discriminate against or give preference to such a party because it did or did not become a signatory or otherwise adhere to such an agreement.

The bill also allows exemptions to this rule to avert an imminent threat to public health or safety or to serve national security, as well as additional exemptions for certain projects meeting specified criteria.

The Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council shall amend the Federal Acquisition Regulation to implement this Act with respect to the applicable federal contracts.