There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Preventing Diabetes in Medicare Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to reduce the occurrence of diabetes in Medicare beneficiaries by extending coverage under Medicare for medical nutrition therapy services to such beneficiaries with pre-diabetes or with risk factors for developing type 2 diabetes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/26/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
04/08/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/27/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/26/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/16/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/16/2015
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/18/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/24/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/24/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/08/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/08/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/28/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/28/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/31/2015
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/31/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2015
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/10/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/10/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/10/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/10/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/10/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/10/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/10/2015
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/16/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/29/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/01/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 10/08/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/09/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/09/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/09/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/09/2015
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 12/09/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 12/18/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/23/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 02/29/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/11/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/11/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/11/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/11/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/11/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/11/2016
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/11/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2016
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/11/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/14/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/14/2016
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/14/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/08/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/08/2016
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/08/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/08/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/08/2016
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 09/20/2016
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 11/15/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/26/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/27/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/26/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health04/08/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1686. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/26/2015)

Preventing Diabetes in Medicare Act of 2015

Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to extend Medicare coverage to medical nutrition therapy services for people with pre-diabetes and risk factors for developing type-2 diabetes.