There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the United States courthouse located at 700 Grant Street in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, as the "Joseph F. Weis Jr. United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
05/29/2015Became Public Law No: 114-20. (TXT | PDF)
05/29/2015Signed by President.
05/26/2015Presented to President.
05/21/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/21/2015Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3249)
04/28/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2484)
04/23/2015Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-90.
03/26/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
05/29/2015Became Public Law No: 114-20. (TXT | PDF)
05/29/2015Signed by President.
05/26/2015HousePresented to President.
05/22/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/21/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/21/2015SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3249)
04/29/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
04/28/2015-4:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/28/2015-4:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2484)
04/28/2015-4:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1690.
04/28/2015-4:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2483-2484)
04/28/2015-4:23pmHouseMr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/23/2015HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 26.
04/23/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-90.
04/15/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/15/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/15/2015HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
03/27/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/26/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/26/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 04/16/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/16/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/16/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/26/2015 Referred to
04/15/2015 Markup by
04/23/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-90
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management03/27/2015 Referred to
04/15/2015 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works04/29/2015 Referred to
05/21/2015 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.1690.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1690. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-20 (05/29/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the U.S. courthouse located at 700 Grant Street in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, as the "Joseph F. Weis Jr. United States Courthouse."