There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Sugar Reform Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reform the Federal sugar program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/26/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/20/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/26/2015Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/26/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/26/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 04/13/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/13/2015
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/13/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/13/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/13/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/13/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/13/2015
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/13/2015
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/14/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/15/2015
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/15/2015
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/15/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/16/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 04/21/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/30/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/14/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/07/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/09/2015
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/10/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/08/2015
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/08/2015
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/18/2015
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/30/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/01/2015
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/17/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/07/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 06/07/2016
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture03/26/2015 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management04/20/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1714. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/26/2015)

Sugar Reform Act of 2015

This bill revises the Department of Agriculture (USDA) sugar program to decrease price support levels and make other modifications.

The bill amends the Federal Agriculture Improvement and Reform Act of 1996 to decrease the rate for price support loans to processors of domestically grown sugarcane and sugar beets. The loan rate is the price level at which processors can take out loans.

The bill amends the Agricultural Adjustment Act of 1938 to require USDA to set the marketing allotments at a level appropriate to maintain adequate domestic supplies at reasonable prices. The allotments limit the amount of sugar that each processor may sell. The allotments may be suspended or modified based on: (1) the interests of consumers, workers, businesses, and agricultural producers; and (2) the relative competitiveness of domestically produced and imported foods containing sugar.

In setting import quotas necessary to comply with trade agreements, USDA must:

  • set the quotas at no less than the minimum level necessary for compliance,
  • adjust the quotas to provide adequate domestic supplies at reasonable prices,
  • establish and adjust quotas so that the ratio of sugar stocks to total sugar use at the end of the year will be approximately 15.5% or the target necessary to prevent unreasonably high prices or forfeitures, and
  • permit the temporary transfer of quotas between countries.

The bill amends the Farm Security and Rural Investment Act of 2002 to repeal the Feedstock Flexibility Program for Bioenergy Producers, which requires USDA to purchase sugar from domestic processors and sell it to bioenergy producers for biofuel production.