There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make members of health care sharing ministries eligible to establish health savings accounts.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/13/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/21/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: House Ways and Means
04/13/2015 Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/13/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (115)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 04/13/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 04/13/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 04/13/2015
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/14/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/16/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/16/2015
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/16/2015
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/16/2015
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/16/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/16/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/16/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/22/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/22/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/22/2015
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/22/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/22/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 04/22/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/28/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/29/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/30/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/30/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/30/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 05/08/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/12/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/13/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/13/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 05/13/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 05/13/2015
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/14/2015
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/19/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/19/2015
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 05/20/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/20/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/01/2015
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/01/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 06/02/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/02/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/08/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/09/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/09/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/09/2015
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/09/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 06/17/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 06/17/2015
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/19/2015
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/19/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/19/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 06/19/2015
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/19/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/23/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/23/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 06/23/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/23/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/24/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/24/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/24/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/24/2015
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/24/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/07/2015
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/07/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/09/2015
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/09/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/14/2015
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/14/2015
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/15/2015
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 07/21/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/23/2015
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/29/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/29/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/29/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/31/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/08/2015
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/09/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/10/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 09/16/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/24/2015
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 09/24/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/25/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/30/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 10/06/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/06/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/20/2015
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 10/23/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 11/04/2015
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/30/2015
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/17/2015
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 01/05/2016
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/09/2016
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/11/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/07/2016
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/11/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/13/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health04/21/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (4)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (4)

  • Health care costs and insurance
  • Income tax deductions
  • Religion

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1752. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/13/2015)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to treat membership in a tax-exempt health care sharing ministry as coverage under a high deductible health plan for purposes of the tax deduction for contributions to a health savings account.