There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Delaware River Basin Conservation Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to establish a nonregulatory program to build on and help coordinate funding for restoration and protection efforts of the 4-State Delaware River Basin region, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/14/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
07/23/2015Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans
05/13/2015Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2886)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/30/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/30/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/15/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/14/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/14/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/14/2015Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/14/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/14/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans04/30/2015 Referred to
07/23/2015 Hearings by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands04/30/2015 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/14/2015 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment04/15/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1772. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/14/2015)

Delaware River Basin Conservation Act of 2015

Requires the United States Fish and Wildlife Service (USFWS) to establish a nonregulatory Delaware River Basin restoration program, under which it shall: (1) draw on management plans for the Basin or portions of the Basin and work in consultation with applicable management entities, including representatives of the Partnership for the Delaware Estuary, the Delaware River Basin Commission, the federal government, other state and local governments, and regional and nonprofit organizations, to identify, prioritize, and implement restoration and protection activities within the Basin; (2) adopt a Basin-wide strategy that supports the implementation of a shared set of science-based restoration and protection activities, targets cost-effective projects with measurable results, and maximizes conservation outcomes with no net gain of federal full-time equivalent employees; and (3) establish voluntary grant and technical assistance programs in accordance with this Act.

Defines "Basin" as the four-state Delaware Basin region, including all of Delaware Bay and portions of Delaware, New Jersey, New York, and Pennsylvania located in the Delaware River watershed.

Requires the USFWS to: (1) establish the Delaware River Basin restoration grant program to provide competitive matching grants to carry out restoration and protection activities within the Basin, and (2) develop criteria for such grant program to ensure that funded activities accomplish specified purposes and advance the implementation of priority actions or needs identified in the strategy adopted under this Act.

Authorizes the USFWS to contract with the National Fish and Wildlife Foundation or another organization that offers grant management services.