There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veteran Emergency Medical Technician Support Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veteran Emergency Medical Technician Support Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Veteran Emergency Medical Technician Support Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide grants to States to streamline State requirements and procedures for veterans with military emergency medical training to become civilian emergency medical technicians.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/12/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 1 (Roll no. 188).(text: CR 5/11/16 CR H2267)
05/10/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-552.
04/15/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
05/16/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
05/12/2016-4:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/12/2016-4:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 1 (Roll no. 188). (text: CR 5/11/16 CR H2267)
05/12/2016-4:12pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2317)
05/11/2016-5:45pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/11/2016-5:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1818.
05/11/2016-5:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2266-2268)
05/11/2016-5:33pmHouseMr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/10/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 426.
05/10/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-552.
04/27/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/27/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/26/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/25/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/20/2016HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/20/2016HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/17/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/15/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/15/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/15/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/30/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/30/2015
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/30/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/30/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/30/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 04/30/2015
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/08/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/08/2015
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/08/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/08/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/08/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/08/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/08/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/08/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/08/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/12/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/12/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/12/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/13/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/14/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 05/15/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/01/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/02/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/02/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/04/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/04/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/23/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/24/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/10/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/29/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 07/29/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/08/2015
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 10/16/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/20/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/20/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 10/23/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/05/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/17/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 11/17/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/30/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/30/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 11/30/2015
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/01/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 12/08/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/15/2015
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/05/2016
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 01/06/2016
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/06/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/11/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/12/2016
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/03/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/09/2016
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/20/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/20/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/20/2016
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/21/2016
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/25/2016
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/25/2016
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/25/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/26/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 04/26/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 04/26/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/27/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 04/27/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/27/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/29/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/29/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/10/2016
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/10/2016
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/10/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/10/2016
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/10/2016
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/10/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/15/2015 Referred to
04/27/2016 Markup by
05/10/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-552
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/17/2015 Referred to
04/20/2016 Markup by
04/20/2016 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/16/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1818. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/12/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 10, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veteran Emergency Medical Technician Support Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to direct the Department of Health and Human Services to establish a demonstration program for states with a shortage of emergency medical technicians (EMTs) to streamline state requirements and procedures to assist veterans who completed military EMT training to meet state EMT certification, licensure, and other requirements.