There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a pilot program to improve access to supportive services and community coordination for families of disabled veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/16/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/01/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/16/2015Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/16/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/16/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/19/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/03/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/15/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/28/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/16/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health05/01/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1843.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1843. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/16/2015)

Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a three-year pilot program with community partners (private nonprofit organizations) to provide intensive community care coordination and supportive services to disabled veteran families who lack access to VA or other direct wellness services.

Authorizes such services to include:

  • care coordination and case management services;
  • outreach services;
  • assistance in obtaining VA benefits, including vocational and rehabilitation counseling, employment and training service, educational assistance, and health care services;
  • assistance in obtaining and coordinating the provision of other public benefits provided in federal, state or local agencies or other community partners, including marriage counseling, services for children, suicide prevention, substance abuse awareness and treatment, mental health awareness and treatment, financial counseling, anger management counseling, domestic violence awareness and prevention, employment assistance, transportation services, child care, housing counseling, preparing and updating family care plans, development of strategies for living with a veteran with post-traumatic stress disorder or traumatic brain injury, and accessing emergency financial assistance through philanthropic efforts; and
  • providing direct services that are necessary to improve the well-being and address the needs of the disabled veteran families but are otherwise unavailable through existing public or private programs.