There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Mental Health First Aid Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Mental Health First Aid Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 520J of the Public Health Service Act to authorize grants for mental health first aid training programs.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/26/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5870)
09/26/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-786.
04/16/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
09/27/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/26/2016-2:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2016-2:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5870)
09/26/2016-2:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1877.
09/26/2016-2:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5870-5871)
09/26/2016-2:10pmHouseMr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/26/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 614.
09/26/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-786.
09/21/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/21/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/20/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/13/2016HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
09/12/2016HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/17/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/16/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/16/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/16/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/01/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/18/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/19/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/01/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/01/2015
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/04/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/04/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/10/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/18/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/18/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/10/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/28/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/29/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/11/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/30/2015
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/06/2015
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 10/07/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 10/07/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/08/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/09/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/09/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/20/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/20/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/02/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 11/04/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 11/04/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/04/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/15/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/16/2015
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/03/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/03/2016
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/11/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/18/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/18/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/24/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/25/2016
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 05/27/2016
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/27/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/03/2016
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/10/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 07/14/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/06/2016
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/12/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/26/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/16/2015 Referred to
09/21/2016 Markup by
09/26/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-786
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/17/2015 Referred to
09/12/2016 Markup by
09/13/2016 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/27/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1877. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/26/2016)

Mental Health First Aid Act of 2016

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to revise and extend through FY2021 training grants for mental health awareness. The bill makes additional categories of individuals eligible to be trained to identify and respond to individuals with a mental illness. Programs funded by these grants must provide education on: (1) recognizing the signs and symptoms of mental illness, and (2) either the availability of relevant resources or safe de-escalation of crisis situations involving individuals with a mental illness.