There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To authorize the Comptroller General of the United States to assess a study on the alternatives for the disposition of Plum Island Animal Disease Center, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend certain appropriation Acts to repeal the requirement directing the Administrator of General Services to sell Federal property and assets that support the operations of the Plum Island Animal Disease Center in Plum Island, New York, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/16/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2406-2407)
05/16/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-568.
04/16/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
05/26/2016SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/17/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
05/16/2016-5:30pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
05/16/2016-5:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/16/2016-5:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2406-2407)
05/16/2016-5:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1887.
05/16/2016-5:15pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2406-2409)
05/16/2016-5:15pmHouseMr. Ratcliffe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/16/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 441.
05/16/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-568.
04/28/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
04/28/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/28/2016HouseSubcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies Discharged.
04/29/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
04/16/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
04/16/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security04/16/2015 Referred to
04/28/2016 Markup by
05/16/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-568
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies04/29/2015 Referred to
04/28/2016 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/26/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1887.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1887. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/16/2016)

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to assess the Department of Homeland Security's (DHS's) study of the options for the disposition of Plum Island, New York. (In 2005, DHS announced that the operations of the Plum Island Animal Disease Center will move from Plum Island, New York, to a new federal facility in Manhattan, Kansas.)

The GAO must determine whether DHS's methodologies adequately support its findings with respect to:

  • the possible alternative uses for Plum Island, including the transfer to another federal agency, a state or local government, a nonprofit organization, or a combination of the entities for the purpose of education, research, or conservation;
  • the issues and implications of the alternative uses; and
  • the cost for the transition, cleanup, and hazard mitigation by a recipient of the property.

If the DHS methodologies do not adequately support its findings related to an issue, the GAO must report to Congress on the issue.

(Sec. 3) The bill suspends until at least 180 days after the GAO submits its reports to Congress the requirement under current law for the General Services Administration to sell the property and assets which support Plum Island operations.