There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Pascua Yaqui Tribe Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Pascua Yaqui Tribe Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Pascua Yaqui Tribe Land Conveyance Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the conveyance of certain land inholdings owned by the United States to the Tucson Unified School District and to the Pascua Yaqui Tribe of Arizona.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/07/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3489)
05/10/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-550.
04/23/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
09/22/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-509.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
06/08/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/07/2016-6:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/07/2016-6:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3489)
06/07/2016-5:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2009.
06/07/2016-5:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3489-3490)
06/07/2016-5:58pmHouseMr. Hardy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/10/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 425.
05/10/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-550.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/16/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/16/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/15/2016HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/15/2016HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/15/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/04/2015HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs
05/11/2015HouseRe-referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/11/2015HouseRe-referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/23/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
04/23/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/23/2015 Referred to
03/16/2016 Markup by
05/10/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-550
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs05/11/2015 Referred to
11/04/2015 Hearings by
03/15/2016 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands05/11/2015 Referred to
03/15/2016 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/08/2016 Referred to
09/22/2016 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2009.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2009. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/07/2016)

Pascua Yaqui Tribe Land Conveyance Act

(Sec. 3) This bill declares that 39.65 acres of land are to be held in trust by the United States for the benefit of the Pascua Yaqui Tribe of Arizona, effective the day after the Tuscon Unified School District No. 1 relinquishes its interest in the land.

(Sec. 4) The United States must convey to the school district 13.24 acres of federal land in exchange for payment of the fair market value of the land and the cost of conveyance.

The school district may acquire the federal reversionary interest in 27.5 acres of district land by paying the appraised value, plus the costs of appraisal and conveyance, to the Department of the Interior.

(Sec. 5) Gaming is prohibited on the land taken into trust pursuant to this bill.

(Sec. 6) There are no federal reserved water rights for the land taken into trust. The tribe retains state water rights for this land. Water rights for this land may not be forfeited or abandoned.