Committees: H.R.2009 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/23/2015 Referred to
03/16/2016 Markup by
05/10/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-550
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs05/11/2015 Referred to
11/04/2015 Hearings by
03/15/2016 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands05/11/2015 Referred to
03/15/2016 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/08/2016 Referred to
09/22/2016 Hearings by