There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Refuge From Cruel Trapping Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To end the use of body-gripping traps in the National Wildlife Refuge System.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/23/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/26/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/23/2015Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/23/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/23/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/28/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/28/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/28/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/28/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/28/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/12/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/12/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/12/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 05/18/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/18/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 05/21/2015
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/01/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/01/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/01/2015
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/03/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/03/2015
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/03/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/04/2015
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/04/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/10/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/10/2015
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/18/2015
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/24/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/08/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/14/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/08/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/28/2015
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 09/30/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/20/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/20/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/20/2015
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/20/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/23/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 11/17/2015
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/17/2015
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/17/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/10/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/10/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/15/2015
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/15/2015
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/18/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 01/05/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/08/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/01/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/01/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/09/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/09/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/02/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/12/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/10/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/17/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/10/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/16/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/13/2016
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/13/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/13/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/14/2016
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/21/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/21/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/14/2016
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 09/15/2016
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/28/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/28/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/14/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/14/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 11/14/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/14/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/14/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/14/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/17/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 12/07/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/07/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/23/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands05/26/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2016. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/23/2015)

Refuge From Cruel Trapping Act

Amends the National Wildlife Refuge System Administration Act of 1966 to prohibit the use or possession of body-gripping traps in the National Wildlife Refuge System.

Imposes on persons who possess or use such traps in the System: (1) for a first offense, a civil fine of up to $500 for each body-gripping trap possessed or used; and (2) for subsequent offenses, a civil fine of up to $1,000 for each body-gripping trap possessed or used, imprisonment for up to 180 days, or both such a civil fine and imprisonment.

Makes any body-gripping traps that are possessed or used in violation of this Act, and any wildlife captured by the use of such traps, including the pelts and raw fur, subject to civil forfeiture.

Requires persons found to be in violation of such prohibition to pay all associated court costs.