There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security and Medicare Parity Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to provide for equal treatment of individuals in same-sex marriages, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/23/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/12/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/12/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/23/2015Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/23/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/23/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/23/2015
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 04/28/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/28/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/28/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/28/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/28/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/28/2015
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/28/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/28/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/29/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/30/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/30/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/30/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/30/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/12/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/12/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/12/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/12/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/12/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/12/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/12/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/13/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/13/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/14/2015
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/14/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/18/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/20/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/21/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/22/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/22/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/01/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/02/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/09/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/22/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/27/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/30/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/23/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/12/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security05/12/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2025. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/23/2015)

Social Security and Medicare Parity Act of 2015

Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act with respect to the determination of a valid marriage to account for marriages in jurisdictions other than a state.

Authorizes the courts of any state to find that an OASDI benefit applicant and an insured individual were validly married in a jurisdiction other than a state at the time the applicant files a benefit application or, if the insured individual is dead, at the time the individual died.

Waives the nine-month marriage requirement to make eligible for widow or widower benefits certain widows or widowers whose marriage to a deceased individual would not have been treated as a marriage for federal law purposes before June 26, 2013. Waives the same requirement for anyone who became a stepchild of the deceased individual as a result of such a marriage.

Waives the one-year marriage requirement to make eligible for husband's or wife's OASDI benefits certain husbands and wives whose marriage to an individual would not have been treated as a marriage for federal law purposes before June 26, 2013. Waives the same requirement for anyone who became a stepchild of the individual as a result of such a marriage.

Directs the Commissioner of Social Security to conduct a comprehensive and effective three-year outreach campaign to encourage benefit applications by individuals newly eligible for OASDI benefits as a result of changes in law relating to same-sex marriage and occurring on or after June 26, 2013.