There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Nepal Temporary Protected Status Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate Nepal under section 244 of the Immigration and Nationality Act to permit nationals of Nepal to be eligible for temporary protected status under such section.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/27/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/15/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/27/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/27/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/27/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/28/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 04/28/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/29/2015
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 04/29/2015
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/29/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/29/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/29/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/29/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/29/2015
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/29/2015
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/29/2015
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/30/2015
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/30/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 04/30/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/30/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/30/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/30/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/30/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/30/2015
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/30/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/30/2015
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/30/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/30/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/30/2015
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/30/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/30/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/30/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/30/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 04/30/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/30/2015
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/30/2015
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/30/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/30/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/30/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/30/2015
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/30/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/30/2015
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/30/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/30/2015
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/30/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 04/30/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/30/2015
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/30/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/30/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/30/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/05/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/05/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/15/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/15/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/15/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/02/2015
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/02/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/27/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security05/15/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2033.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2033. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/27/2015)

Nepal Temporary Protected Status Act of 2015

Expresses the sense of Congress that the extraordinary and temporary conditions caused by the magnitude 7.8 earthquake, its aftershocks, and additional damage in Nepal qualifies Nepal for designation under section 244 of the Immigration and Nationality Act, pursuant to which nationals of Nepal would be eligible for temporary protected status in the United States.

Extends 18-month temporary protected status to a national of Nepal who: (1) has been continuously physically present in the United States since April 25, 2015, (2) is admissible as an immigrant and not ineligible for temporary protected status, and (3) registers for temporary protected status in a manner that the Secretary of Homeland Security shall establish.

Permits such an alien to travel abroad if the alien establishes to the satisfaction of the Secretary that emergency and extenuating circumstances beyond the alien's control require his or her departure for a brief, temporary trip abroad.