There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

FDA Deeming Authority Clarification Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to provide for a certain effective date with respect to deemed tobacco products, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/28/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/01/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
04/28/2015 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2015 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E596)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 04/29/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/29/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/29/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/01/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/14/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/14/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/14/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/14/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/18/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/21/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/21/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 05/21/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/09/2015
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/09/2015
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/09/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 06/15/2015
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/15/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/15/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/15/2015
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/25/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/09/2015
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/09/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/09/2015
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 07/22/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/28/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/28/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 11/02/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/04/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/05/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/18/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/01/2015
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 12/01/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 12/03/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/10/2015
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 12/10/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 12/11/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 01/05/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/05/2016
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/11/2016
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/11/2016
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/13/2016
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/03/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/03/2016
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/03/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/03/2016
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/11/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 02/11/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/11/2016
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/24/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 02/24/2016
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/02/2016
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/12/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 05/13/2016
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/16/2016
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/23/2016
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/23/2016
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/25/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/26/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/07/2016
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/07/2016
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/10/2016
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/10/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/10/2016
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/13/2016
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/13/2016
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/07/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 07/07/2016
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 07/07/2016
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/13/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/13/2016
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/13/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/06/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/06/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/06/2016
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 09/06/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/12/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 09/12/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/28/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/01/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.2058.

Subjects (6)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Department of Health and Human Services
  • Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
  • Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
  • Food and Drug Administration (FDA)

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2058. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/2015)

FDA Deeming Authority Clarification Act of 2015

This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to revise premarket review and reporting requirements for products deemed by the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) to be tobacco products.

A product is not subject to premarket review by the FDA if it is introduced to market before that type of product is deemed a tobacco product.

A person introducing a tobacco product that is substantially similar to a marketed product less than 21 months after that type of product is deemed a tobacco product must submit a report to the FDA on the similar product not later than 21 months after that type of product is deemed a tobacco product. (A report is required at least 90 days prior to introduction of a tobacco product that is substantially similar to a marketed product if that type of product has been deemed a tobacco product for 21 months or more.)