There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Child Support Assistance Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Support Assistance Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Credit Reporting Act to clarify the ability to request consumer reports in certain cases to establish and enforce child support payments and awards.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/06/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6801)
10/06/2015Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-282.
04/29/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
10/07/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
10/06/2015-4:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/06/2015-4:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6801)
10/06/2015-4:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2091.
10/06/2015-4:02pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6801-6802)
10/06/2015-4:02pmHouseMr. Neugebauer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/06/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 214.
10/06/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-282.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/29/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 56 - 2.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/29/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/28/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
06/11/2015HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit
04/29/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
04/29/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 04/29/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services04/29/2015 Referred to
07/29/2015 Markup by
10/06/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-282
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit06/11/2015 Hearings by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs10/07/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2091. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/06/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Child Support Assistance Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Amends the Fair Credit Reporting Act, with respect to the permissible purposes of consumer reports, to authorize a consumer reporting agency to furnish a consumer report in response to a request by the head of a state or local child support enforcement agency (or an authorized state or local government official), if the requester certifies that the report is needed for enforcing a child support order, award, agreement, or judgment.

Repeals the requirement for 10 days' prior notice to a consumer whose report is requested.