There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a comprehensive assessment of the scientific and technical research on the implications of the use of mid-level ethanol blends, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/06/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
02/19/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
01/09/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/06/2015Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/2015Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/2015Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (15)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/27/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/27/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 01/27/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 01/27/2015
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 01/27/2015
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/28/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/03/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/13/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/13/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 03/24/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/21/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/19/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 06/11/2015
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/24/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/21/2016
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/28/2015 05/01/2015 --

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology01/06/2015 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment02/19/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/06/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power01/09/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.21.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.21. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/06/2015)

This bill requires the Office of Research and Development at the Environmental Protection Agency to enter into an agreement with the National Academy of Sciences to provide a comprehensive assessment of research on the implications of the use of mid-level ethanol blends, which compares mid-level ethanol blends to gasoline blends containing 10% or 0% ethanol. A mid-level ethanol blend is an ethanol-gasoline blend containing 10%- 20% of ethanol by volume that is intended to be used in any conventional gasoline-powered motor vehicle or nonroad vehicle or engine.

The assessment must: (1) evaluate the environmental, safety, durability, and performance effects of the introduction of mid-level blends on onroad, nonroad, and marine engines, onroad and nonroad vehicles, and related equipment; and (2) identify areas of research, development, and testing necessary to ensure that existing motor fuel infrastructure is not adversely impacted by mid-level ethanol blends and to reduce the risk of misfueling by users at various points in the distribution and supply chain.

The Office must report on the assessment's findings. Any waivers granted under the Clean Air Act to allow the sale of mid-level ethanol blends for use in motor vehicles are nullified. The Office is also prohibited from granting new waivers until after the report is submitted.