There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Audit Improvement Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to reform the practices of recovery audit contractors under the Medicare program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/30/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
05/18/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/01/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/30/2015Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/30/2015Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/30/2015Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/30/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (87)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/30/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 04/30/2015
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 04/30/2015
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 04/30/2015
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/05/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 05/05/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/08/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/08/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/08/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/08/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/12/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/12/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/12/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/12/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/12/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/12/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/13/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/13/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/14/2015
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 05/14/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/14/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/14/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/14/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/18/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/18/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 05/18/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/18/2015
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/18/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/19/2015
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/19/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/19/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/26/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 06/02/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/02/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/02/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/03/2015
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/09/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/12/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/16/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/17/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/17/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/23/2015
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/23/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/25/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/07/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/07/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 07/07/2015
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/13/2015
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/16/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/21/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/22/2015
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/28/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 07/29/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/31/2015
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/31/2015
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 09/09/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/09/2015
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/09/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/09/2015
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/16/2015
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 09/24/2015
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/29/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 09/30/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 10/07/2015
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/09/2015
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/09/2015
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 10/21/2015
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/23/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/28/2015
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/02/2015
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/04/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 11/05/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 11/16/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 11/19/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 12/03/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/18/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/05/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 02/01/2016
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/12/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/23/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/11/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/11/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/11/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/11/2016
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 07/06/2016
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/12/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/08/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/30/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/18/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/30/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/01/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2156. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/30/2015)

Medicare Audit Improvement Act of 2015

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act (SSAct) with respect to the practices of recovery audit contractors (RACs) under the Medicare program fin identifying underpayments and overpayments and recouping overpayments.

Incentive payments to a RAC for recovery activities are prohibited for FY2015 and subsequent fiscal years.

Payments for recovery activities shall be reduced, according to a sliding scale established by the Secretary of Health and Human Services, to any RAC with a complex audit denial rate at the end of a fiscal year, determined pursuant to a specified formula, that is .1% or greater.

The one-year timely filing limit for certain rebilled SSAct title XVIII part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) claims is eliminated, extending the deadline for the rebill to 180 days after final denial of the claim.

A determination of whether inpatient hospital services or inpatient critical access hospital services furnished to an individual are reasonable and necessary shall now be based solely on information available to the admitting physician at the time of the inpatient admission of the individual for such services, as documented in the medical record.