There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Disabled Veterans' Access to Medical Exams Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the authority of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to enter into contracts with private physicians to conduct medical disability examinations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/01/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/09/2015Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
07/09/2015Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
06/24/2015Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
05/26/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/01/2015Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/01/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs05/26/2015 Referred to
06/24/2015 Hearings by
07/09/2015 Markup by
07/09/2015 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2214.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2214. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/01/2015)

Disabled Veterans' Access to Medical Exams Improvement Act

Amends the Veterans Benefits Act of 2003 to extend until December 31, 2017, the authority of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide for persons other than VA employees (i.e., contract physicians) to conduct medical disability examinations of applicants for benefits under laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.

Permits licensed, VA-contracted physicians to conduct such examinations at any location in any state, the District of Columbia, or a Commonwealth, territory, or possession of the United States, so long as the examination is authorized under the contract and the physician is not barred from conducting such an examination in the location in which it occurs.

Amends the Veterans' Benefits Improvement Act of 1996 to provide similar authorities with respect to permissible examination locations to licensed physicians under the pilot program authorizing the VA to use contract physicians to perform medical disability examinations of applicants for benefits under laws carried out through the Under Secretary for Benefits. Expands from 10 to 15 the maximum number of VA regional offices through which the Secretary is authorized to carry out such pilot program.

Directs the Secretary to conduct an annual data analysis (including an analysis of backlogged claims, pending workloads, and the timeliness of completed cases) to determine the regional offices requiring support.