There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Equity in Government Compensation Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Equity in Government Compensation Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To suspend the current compensation packages for the senior executives of Fannie Mae and Freddie Mac and establish compensation for such positions in accordance with rates of pay for senior employees in the Executive Branch of the Federal Government, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/16/2015Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
11/16/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-339, Part I.
05/08/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
11/16/2015Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 261.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2015Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-339, Part I.
07/29/2015Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 1.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/29/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/28/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
05/08/2015Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2015Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2015Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 05/08/2015
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/13/2015
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/13/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 05/19/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/22/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/27/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services05/08/2015 Referred to
07/29/2015 Markup by
11/16/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-339
House Oversight and Government Reform05/08/2015 Referred to
11/16/2015 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2243. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (11/16/2015)

Equity in Government Compensation Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Director of the Federal Housing Finance Agency to: (1) suspend immediately the compensation packages approved for 2015 for the chief executive officers of the Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) and the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Freddie Mac) (government-sponsored enterprises or GSEs); and (2) establish, in lieu of such packages, the compensation and benefits for each such officer at the same level in effect as of January 1, 2015.

Such compensation and benefits may not thereafter be increased.

This requirement may not be construed to affect the applicability to the chief executive officer of each GSE of the prohibition against receiving bonuses during any period of conservatorship on or after April 4, 2012.

(Sec. 4) Any executive officer affected by this Act shall not be considered a federal employee.