There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Cadet Nurse Corps Equity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that service of the members of the organization known as the United States Cadet Nurse Corps during World War II constituted active military service for purposes of laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/12/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
08/13/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/26/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/12/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/12/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs05/26/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services05/12/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel08/13/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2248. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/12/2015)

United States Cadet Nurse Corps Equity Act

This bill deems as active military service for Department of Veterans Affairs purposes any service as a member of the United States Cadet Nurse Corps between July 1, 1943, and December 15, 1945 (qualified service).

The Department of Defense shall issue an honorable discharge within one year to each person whose qualified service warrants one.

Retroactive benefits shall not be paid to persons as a result of enactment of this Act.