There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Firearm Safety Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Consumer Product Safety Act to remove the exclusion of pistols, revolvers, and other firearms from the definition of consumer product in order to permit the issuance of safety standards for such articles by the Consumer Product Safety Commission.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/09/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/08/2015Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/16/2015
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/16/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/16/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/16/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/16/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/30/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/14/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/14/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/14/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 07/09/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/09/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/09/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/11/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/28/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/08/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 12/18/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/18/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/18/2015
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/18/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/18/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/18/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/18/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/18/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/18/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/18/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 01/11/2016
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/11/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/11/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 01/11/2016
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/11/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 01/11/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/11/2016
Del. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 02/08/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/08/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/08/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/08/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/08/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 02/08/2016
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/08/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 02/08/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/08/2016
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/08/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/08/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/07/2016
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/07/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 04/12/2016
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/21/2016
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/06/2016
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/06/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/06/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/06/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/06/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/22/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/22/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/22/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/22/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/22/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/22/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/22/2016
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/14/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/14/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 11/14/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/08/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade01/09/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.225.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.225. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2015)

Firearm Safety Act of 2015

Amends the Consumer Product Safety Act to remove from the definition of "consumer product" the exclusion for any article sold by a manufacturer, producer, or importer that would be subject to a firearms sales tax under the Internal Revenue Code for pistols, revolvers, and other firearms, including shells and cartridges, thereby permitting the Consumer Product Safety Commission to issue safety standards for such articles.