There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Billy Frank Jr. Tell Your Story Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Billy Frank Jr. Tell Your Story Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Billy Frank Jr. Tell Your Story Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Billy Frank Jr. Tell Your Story Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Billy Frank Jr. Tell Your Story Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To redesignate the Nisqually National Wildlife Refuge, located in the State of Washington, as the Billy Frank Jr. Nisqually National Wildlife Refuge, to establish the Medicine Creek Treaty National Memorial within the wildlife refuge, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To redesignate the Nisqually National Wildlife Refuge, located in the State of Washington, as the Billy Frank Jr. Nisqually National Wildlife Refuge, to establish the Medicine Creek Treaty National Historic Site within the wildlife refuge, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/18/2015Became Public Law No: 114-101. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2015Signed by President.
12/16/2015Presented to President.
12/14/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8640)
11/30/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 2 (Roll no. 645).(text: CR H8430)
11/16/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-335.
05/12/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
12/18/2015Became Public Law No: 114-101. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2015Signed by President.
12/16/2015HousePresented to President.
12/15/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/14/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8640)
12/01/2015SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/30/2015-7:05pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2015-7:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 2 (Roll no. 645). (text: CR H8430)
11/30/2015-7:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2015-6:58pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8433)
11/30/2015-5:26pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/30/2015-5:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2270.
11/30/2015-5:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8429-8431)
11/30/2015-5:13pmHouseMr. LaMalfa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/16/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 256.
11/16/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-335.
10/08/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
10/08/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/08/2015HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
10/07/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/14/2015HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
06/04/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/14/2015HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2967)
05/12/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/12/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/12/2015 Referred to
10/08/2015 Markup by
11/16/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-335
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/04/2015 Referred to
07/14/2015 Hearings by
10/08/2015 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2270. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-101 (12/17/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on November 16, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Billy Frank Jr. Tell Your Story Act

(Sec. 2) This bill redesignates the Nisqually National Wildlife Refuge in Washington state as the Billy Frank Jr. Nisqually National Wildlife Refuge.

(Sec. 3) The bill establishes, as a unit of the National Park System, the Medicine Creek Treaty National Memorial within the Billy Frank Jr. Nisqually National Wildlife Refuge to commemorate the location of the signing of the Medicine Creek Treaty of 1854 between the U.S. government and leaders of the Muckleshoot, Nisqually, Puyallup, and Squaxin Island Indian Tribes.

The Department of the Interior must: (1) establish the boundaries of the Medicine Creek Treaty National Memorial and to provide for its administration and interpretation by the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service; and (2) coordinate with representatives of the Muckleshoot, Nisqually, Puyallup, and Squaxin Island Indian Tribes in providing for that interpretation.