There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To remove the use restrictions on certain land transferred to Rockingham County, Virginia, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
08/30/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/14/2016 without amendment. With written report No. 114-313.
11/30/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 644).(text: CR H8427)
10/06/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-286.
05/13/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/30/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 585.
08/30/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/14/2016 without amendment. With written report No. 114-313.
07/13/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/17/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-496.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
12/01/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
11/30/2015-6:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 644). (text: CR H8427)
11/30/2015-6:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2015-6:32pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8432-8433)
11/30/2015-5:03pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/30/2015-4:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2288.
11/30/2015-4:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8427-8428)
11/30/2015-4:53pmHouseMr. LaMalfa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/06/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 218.
10/06/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-286.
09/10/2015HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
09/10/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/10/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/09/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/04/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/13/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/13/2015HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E691)
05/13/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/13/2015 Referred to
09/10/2015 Markup by
10/06/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-286
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/04/2015 Referred to
09/10/2015 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/01/2015 Referred to
07/13/2016 Markup by
08/30/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-313
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks03/17/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2288. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (08/30/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on October 6, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill declares that the approximately one-acre portion of specified land transferred by the United States to Rockingham County, Virginia, that is used for purposes of a child care center, shall not be subject to the use restriction imposed in the deed for the transferred land.

Eliminated is the requirement for the county to include information concerning the use of the transferred land for a child care center in biennial reports to the Department of the Interior.