There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Volunteer Organization Protection Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Volunteer Organization Protection Act of 1997, to provide for liability protection for organizations or entities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/13/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/01/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/13/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 05/13/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/18/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/20/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/20/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/21/2015
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/21/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/21/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/29/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/01/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/01/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/01/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/02/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/02/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/02/2015
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/04/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/08/2015
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 06/08/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 06/12/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 06/12/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/12/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/24/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 06/24/2015
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/25/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/07/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/23/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 09/30/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/30/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 12/07/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 01/11/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/01/2016
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/25/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/11/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/11/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 04/19/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 05/10/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/12/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 05/12/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/17/2016
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/23/2016
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/25/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 05/25/2016
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 05/31/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 06/09/2016
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/10/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/20/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/06/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/06/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/06/2016
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/06/2016
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/08/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 09/21/2016
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/13/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice06/01/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2290. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/13/2015)

Volunteer Organization Protection Act of 2015

Amends the Volunteer Protection Act of 1997 to expand liability protections to volunteer nonprofit organizations for harm caused by an act or omission of a volunteer on behalf of the organization.

Prohibits such liability protections from applying if the organization: (1) would be liable under laws governing the direct or vicarious liability of organizations, and (2) expressly authorized the specific conduct constituting the act or omission.

Bars such an organization from liability for harm caused by the organization, or a volunteer acting on its behalf, if the act or omission was at the request of, or pursuant to an authorization by, a state, the United States, or another governmental subdivision, provided that: (1) the requesting or authorizing governmental entity would have been immune either from suit or from liability in damages if it had engaged in the acts or omissions itself or through employees or independent contractors; or (2) the governmental employee, agent, or contractor would have been immune either from suit or from liability in damages by virtue of immunity extended to individual governmental actors.

Prohibits punitive damages from being awarded against a volunteer nonprofit organization for the actions of a volunteer within the scope of the volunteer's responsibilities to the organization unless the claimant establishes by clear and convincing evidence that the organization itself expressly authorized the volunteer's action with a conscious, flagrant indifference to the rights or safety of the individual harmed.