There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom from Discrimination in Credit Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Equal Credit Opportunity Act to prohibit discrimination on account of sexual orientation or gender identity when extending credit.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/13/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/13/2015Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/13/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/13/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/13/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/18/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/18/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/29/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/29/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/01/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/02/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/04/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/09/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/10/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/17/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/17/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/25/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/25/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/20/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/20/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/26/2016
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 05/10/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/13/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2309. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/13/2015)

Freedom from Discrimination in Credit Act of 2015

Amends the Equal Credit Opportunity Act to expand the categories of prohibited discrimination when extending credit to include discrimination on account of sexual orientation or gender identity. (Currently, such discrimination in credit is prohibited only on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex or marital status, or age.)

Provides for such Act to apply whether the basis for certain prohibited forms of discrimination is actual or perceived.

Defines: (1) "gender identity" as the gender-related identity, appearance, or mannerisms or other gender-related characteristics of an individual with or without regard to the individual's designated sex at birth; and (2) "sexual orientation" as homosexuality, heterosexuality, or bisexuality.