There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Nutritious Options for Meals Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 to change the eligible foods allowed for purchase under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (commonly known as SNAP).


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/15/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/08/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/15/2015Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (16)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/15/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 05/15/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/15/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/15/2015
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 05/15/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 05/15/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 05/15/2015
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 05/15/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 05/15/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 05/18/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/22/2015
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/22/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/22/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 05/22/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/22/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/22/2015
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/18/2015 06/09/2015 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/15/2015 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Nutrition06/08/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2383. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/15/2015)

Nutritious Options for Meals Act of 2015

This bill amends the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 to apply nutritional standards for the Department of Agriculture's (USDA's) Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children (WIC) to foods purchased for USDA's Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP, formerly known as the food stamp program), with the addition of lean meat and poultry.

Foods purchased for SNAP must be of the kind prescribed by USDA in implementing WIC requirements that: (1) food contain nutrients determined by nutritional research to be lacking in the diets of pregnant, breastfeeding, and postpartum women, infants, or children; or (2) food promote the health of the population served by the program. Examples of foods acceptable under the bill include vegetables, fruits, milk, juice, breakfast cereal, cheese, eggs, yogurt, peanut butter, legumes, whole grain bread, and lean meat or poultry.