There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Coal Healthcare and Pensions Protection Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 to transfer certain funds to the Multiemployer Health Benefit Plan and the 1974 United Mine Workers of America Pension Plan.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/18/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
06/10/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/01/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/18/2015Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/18/2015Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/18/2015Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/18/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (87)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/18/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/19/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/20/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/21/2015
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 06/02/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/02/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/02/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/02/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/02/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/02/2015
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/02/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/02/2015
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/02/2015
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/02/2015
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/02/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/02/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/02/2015
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/11/2015
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/11/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/16/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/24/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/07/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 07/07/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/07/2015
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/08/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/09/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/09/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/10/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/16/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/21/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/23/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/23/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 07/23/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/23/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/27/2015
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/29/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/29/2015
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/29/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/10/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/10/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/17/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/26/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 11/03/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 11/03/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/03/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/17/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/17/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/17/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/02/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/02/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/18/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/11/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 02/26/2016
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/17/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/17/2016
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/29/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 05/17/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/17/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/09/2016
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/06/2016
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 07/06/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 07/08/2016
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/08/2016
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/08/2016
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 07/08/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/11/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/12/2016
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/13/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/13/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/14/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/20/2016
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/28/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/28/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 09/28/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/18/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/01/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources05/18/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources06/10/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2403. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/18/2015)

Coal Healthcare and Pensions Protection Act of 2015

Amends the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 to address potential shortages in the Multiemployer Health Benefit Plan for payment of health care benefits to retired coal miners by expanding the eligible uses of interest transferable to the plan from the Abandoned Mine Reclamation Fund, and supplemental payments from the General Fund of the Treasury.

Requires calculation of such amount by taking into account only those beneficiaries who are actually enrolled in the plan as of the enactment of this Act, as well as those retirees whose health benefits, payable directly by an employer in the bituminous coal industry under a coal wage agreement as a result of a bankruptcy proceeding commenced in 2012, would be denied or reduced.

Requires the Department of the Treasury to transfer to the trustees of the 1974 United Mine Workers of America (UMWA) Pension Plan a certain additional amount of funds, to pay pension benefits required under that plan, if the $490 million limitation on certain transfers to the UMWA Combined Benefit Fund and distributions to states and Indian tribes exceeds the aggregate amount required to be transferred to them.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to prescribe a special rule that employer contributions to an employees' trust or annuity benefit plan providing supplemental benefits solely to participants in a pension plan are neither deductible nor nondeductible as such from the employer's gross income. Subjects such contributions, on the other hand, to deduction as an allowable trade or business expense.

Treats a trust holding the assets of such a pension benefit plan as a tax-exempt organization.

Excludes from taxable wages any payments made to, or on behalf of, an employee or his or her beneficiary under such a plan.