There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PACE Act of 2015
Promoting Access, Competition, and Equity Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act with respect to the treatment of hospitals under the Medicare program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/21/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/03/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/22/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/02/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/02/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/02/2015
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/02/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/02/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/02/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/04/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/04/2015
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/10/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/10/2015
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/10/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/16/2015
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/23/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/23/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/23/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/15/2015
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/27/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 07/27/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/29/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 09/08/2015
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/08/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/09/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/06/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/08/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/20/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/26/2015
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/01/2015
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 12/01/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/08/2015
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 12/15/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/25/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/15/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/11/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/17/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/17/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/19/2016
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/08/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 09/12/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/21/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/03/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/21/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/22/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2513.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2513. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/21/2015)

Promoting Access, Competition, and Equity Act of 2015 or the PACE Act of 2015

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to ease application criteria and procedures for physician-owned hospitals to expand their facilities. Under current law, expansion of physician-owned hospitals is subject to certain limitations, such as those regarding the extent and frequency of expansion and requiring community output. The bill suspends these limitations with respect to applications for expansion filed before October 1, 2019.

Following the end of this suspension period, hospitals with consistently high quality ratings are included among those hospitals that may apply to expand their facilities. The Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services may not alter the methodology for computing a hospital's quality rating before October 1, 2019.

With respect to hospitals under development as of March 23, 2010, the bill extends to May 1, 2015, the date by which a hospital may qualify for an exception to the ownership or investment prohibition on physician self-referrals.

The bill also: (1) exempts physician-owned hospitals from specified documentation and coding adjustments, and (2) extends reductions in certain inflationary increases associated with Medicare payments for inpatient hospital services.