There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Friendly Airports for Mothers Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to provide for private lactation areas in the terminals of large and medium hub airports, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/21/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/22/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/21/2015Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/21/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/22/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/04/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/04/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/04/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/04/2015
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/10/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/10/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/10/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/10/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/11/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/11/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/12/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/12/2015
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/16/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/16/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/16/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/23/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/23/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/23/2015
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/23/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 06/23/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/24/2015
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/24/2015
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/25/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/25/2015
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/25/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/07/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/07/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/07/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/13/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/13/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/13/2015
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 07/13/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/15/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/15/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/15/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/16/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/16/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/23/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/23/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/27/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/15/2015
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 09/25/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/25/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/21/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/02/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/02/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/09/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/12/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/21/2015 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation05/22/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2530.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2530. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/21/2015)

Friendly Airports for Mothers Act of 2015

This bill authorizes the Secretary of Transportation to approve a grant application for an airport development project only if the Secretary receives written assurances that the owner or operator of a large or medium hub airport will maintain a lactation area at each passenger terminal building of the airport behind the airport security screening area.

The bill defines "lactation area" to mean a room or other location in a commercial service airport for members of the public to express breast milk that:

  • is shielded from view and free from intrusion from the public;
  • has a door that can be locked;
  • includes a place to sit, a table or other flat surface, and an electrical outlet;
  • is readily accessible to and usable by individuals with disabilities; and
  • is not located in a restroom.

The Secretary may approve a terminal development project for the construction or installation of a lactation area at a commercial service airport.