There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the "PFC Milton A. Lee Medal of Honor Memorial Highway" in the State of Texas.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/07/2015Became Public Law No: 114-49. (TXT | PDF)
08/07/2015Signed by President.
08/06/2015Presented to President.
08/05/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/05/2015Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6425)
06/15/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 0 (Roll no. 365).(text: CR H4352)
05/21/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
08/07/2015Became Public Law No: 114-49. (TXT | PDF)
08/07/2015Signed by President.
08/06/2015HousePresented to President.
08/06/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/05/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/05/2015SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6425)
08/05/2015SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
06/16/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
06/15/2015-7:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/15/2015-7:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 0 (Roll no. 365). (text: CR H4352)
06/15/2015-7:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4361-4362)
06/15/2015-4:17pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/15/2015-4:09pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2559.
06/15/2015-4:09pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4352-4353)
06/15/2015-4:09pmHouseMr. Graves (MO) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/22/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/21/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
05/21/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/21/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/21/2015
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 05/21/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/21/2015 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit05/22/2015 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works06/16/2015 Referred to
08/05/2015 Markup by
08/05/2015 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.2559.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2559. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-49 (08/07/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) The segment of Interstate Route 10 between milepost 535 and milepost 545 at Kendall County, Texas, shall now be the "PFC Milton A. Lee Medal of Honor Memorial Highway."