There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Improving Rural Call Quality and Reliability Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Rural Call Quality and Reliability Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to ensure the integrity of voice communications and to prevent unjust or unreasonable discrimination among areas of the United States in the delivery of such communications.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/14/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6127-6128)
11/14/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-805.
05/21/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
11/16/2016SenateRead twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 668.
11/15/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
11/14/2016-3:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/14/2016-3:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6127-6128)
11/14/2016-3:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2566.
11/14/2016-3:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6127-6129)
11/14/2016-3:19pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/14/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 629.
11/14/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-805.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/21/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/21/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/20/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/13/2016HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
09/13/2016HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
09/12/2016HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
05/22/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/21/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/21/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/21/2015 Referred to
09/21/2016 Markup by
11/14/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-805
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology05/22/2015 Referred to
09/13/2016 Markup by
09/13/2016 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2566. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/14/2016)

Improving Rural Call Quality and Reliability Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Communications Act of 1934 to require intermediate providers that offer the capability to transmit voice communications and signaling information from one destination to another, and that charge a rate to any other entity (including an affiliated entity) for such a transmission, to: (1) register with the Federal Communications Commission (FCC), and (2) comply with service quality standards to be established by the FCC.

An "intermediate provider" is an entity that: (1) enters a business arrangement with a long-distance voice service provider that makes the initial call path choice for more than 100,000 domestic retail subscriber lines, or with another intermediate provider, to carry, route, or transmit voice traffic from a call placed from or to an end user connection using a North American Numbering Plan resource; and (2) does not itself (directly or in conjunction with an affiliate) serve as such a long-distance initial call path choice provider in the context of originating or terminating a given call.

The bill prohibits such long-distance providers (including local exchange carriers, interexchange carriers, commercial mobile radio services, interconnected voice over Internet Protocol [VoIP] services, and certain non-interconnected VoIP services) from using an intermediate provider to transmit voice communications and signals unless the intermediate provider is so registered.

The FCC must: (1) ensure the integrity of the transmission of voice communications to all customers in the United States, (2) prevent unjust or unreasonable discrimination among areas of the United States in the delivery of such voice communications, and (3) make a registry of intermediate providers publicly available on the FCC website.

The bill shall not be construed to preempt or expand the authority of a state agency or public utility commission to collect data, or enforce state law and regulations, regarding the completion of intrastate voice communications.

Certain long-distance providers that make initial call path choices are exempt from service quality standards that the FCC is required to establish under this bill if they certify under a safe harbor provision in existing FCC rules that they monitor the performance of, or do not use, intermediate providers.