There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

BARN Act
Better Agriculture Resources Now Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reform the H-2A program for nonimmigrant agricultural workers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/01/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/01/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/01/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (14)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 06/01/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 06/01/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 06/01/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/01/2015
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 06/01/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 06/01/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/01/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 06/01/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 06/23/2015
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/14/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/16/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/21/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/29/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/21/2015
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/01/2015 06/17/2015 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/01/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security06/16/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2588.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2588. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/01/2015)

Better Agriculture Resources Now Act or the BARN Act

Revises the H-2A nonimmigrant agricultural worker visa program, including with respect to: (1) agricultural labor and services, (2) application requirements, (3) wages, (4) period of authorized nonimmigrant status, (5) housing, (6) legal assistance, and (7) violations.